Refine your search

Refined by:

Pennsylvania Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4]* 01/27/2014
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12]* 01/27/2014
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 01/28/2014
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 02/05/2014
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 02/25/2014
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 03/12/2014
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 03/13/2014
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/07/2014
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 04/28/2014
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/30/2014
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 04/30/2014
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/06/2014
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 05/07/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/17/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 09/19/2014