Refine your search

Refined by:

Tennessee Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 02/04/2014
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 02/04/2014
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 02/05/2014
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/10/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/21/2014
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 02/27/2014
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 03/04/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/08/2014