Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 01/27/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12]* 01/27/2014
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4]* 01/27/2014
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2]* 01/27/2014
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 01/28/2014
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 01/28/2014
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 02/03/2014
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/03/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/03/2014
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 02/04/2014
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/04/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 02/05/2014
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 02/10/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 02/10/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 02/11/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/11/2014
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 02/11/2014
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/11/2014
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/21/2014
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/21/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 02/21/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 02/25/2014
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 02/25/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 02/25/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/27/2014
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 02/27/2014
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 02/28/2014
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 03/12/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 03/12/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 03/13/2014
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/18/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/24/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/24/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/24/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 03/26/2014
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 03/26/2014
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/27/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 03/27/2014
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/28/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/28/2014
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 03/28/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/07/2014
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 04/07/2014
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/07/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 04/10/2014
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/28/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/28/2014
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/28/2014
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 04/28/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/28/2014
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/01/2014
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/06/2014
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 05/07/2014
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 05/07/2014
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 05/09/2014
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 05/09/2014
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 05/19/2014
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 05/19/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/20/2014
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/20/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 05/20/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 05/28/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/08/2014
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 07/08/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/17/2014
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 11/17/2014