Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 01/29/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 02/04/2014
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 02/06/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 03/11/2014
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 03/12/2014
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 03/18/2014
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 04/04/2014
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 04/10/2014
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 05/08/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/28/2014
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 05/28/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/23/2014
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 07/10/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 07/28/2014
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 12/01/2014