Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 01/29/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 01/29/2014
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 01/29/2014
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1]* 01/29/2014
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5]* 01/29/2014
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 01/29/2014
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2]* 01/29/2014
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14]* 01/29/2014
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8]* 01/29/2014
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9]* 01/29/2014
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2]* 01/29/2014
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4]* 01/29/2014
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 01/29/2014
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 01/29/2014
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 01/29/2014
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1]* 01/29/2014
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 01/29/2014
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 01/29/2014
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17]* 01/29/2014
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 01/29/2014
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5]* 01/29/2014
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 01/29/2014
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 02/04/2014
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 02/04/2014
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 02/05/2014
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 02/06/2014
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/10/2014
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 02/10/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/11/2014
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 02/18/2014
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 02/26/2014
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 02/26/2014
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 02/26/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 02/28/2014
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/05/2014
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/07/2014
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 03/07/2014