There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

New Opportunities for Bicycle and Pedestrian Infrastructure Financing Act of 2014

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the Secretary of Transportation to establish a pedestrian and bicycle infrastructure credit assistance pilot program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/29/2014Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
01/30/2014Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
01/29/2014Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/29/2014Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (58)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 01/29/2014
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 01/29/2014
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 01/29/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/10/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/10/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/11/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/21/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/21/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/21/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 02/21/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 02/27/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 02/27/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 02/27/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 03/06/2014
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 03/06/2014
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/11/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 03/11/2014
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/11/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 03/11/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/11/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 03/12/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 03/12/2014
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/14/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 03/14/2014
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 03/25/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/25/2014
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 03/25/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/25/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 03/25/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 03/25/2014
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 03/25/2014
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 03/25/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/25/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/26/2014
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/28/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 03/28/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 03/28/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/03/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 04/03/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 04/03/2014
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/28/2014
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 04/28/2014
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/28/2014
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 05/19/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 05/19/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 05/22/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 05/22/2014
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/29/2014
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/02/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/05/2014
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/25/2014
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 07/08/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 07/10/2014
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/10/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/14/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/29/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 07/31/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 09/08/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure01/29/2014 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Highways and Transit01/30/2014 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3978. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/29/2014)

New Opportunities for Bicycle and Pedestrian Infrastructure Financing Act of 2014 - Authorizes the Secretary of Transportation (DOT) to establish a pilot program to make loans and loan guarantees to eligible entities to carry out bicycle and pedestrian infrastructure projects.

Prescribes project eligibility requirements.

Requires the Secretary to ensure that at least 25% of funds provided under this Act are used to support projects in low-income communities.