Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 01/29/2014
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 01/29/2014
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 01/29/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/10/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/10/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/11/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/21/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/21/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/21/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 02/21/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 02/27/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 02/27/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 02/27/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 03/06/2014
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 03/06/2014
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/11/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 03/11/2014
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/11/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 03/11/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/11/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 03/12/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 03/12/2014
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/14/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 03/14/2014
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 03/25/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/25/2014
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 03/25/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/25/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 03/25/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 03/25/2014
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 03/25/2014
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 03/25/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/25/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/26/2014
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/28/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 03/28/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 03/28/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/03/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 04/03/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 04/03/2014
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/28/2014
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 04/28/2014
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/28/2014
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 05/19/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 05/19/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 05/22/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 05/22/2014
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/29/2014
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/02/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/05/2014
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/25/2014
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 07/08/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 07/10/2014
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/10/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/14/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/29/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 07/31/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 09/08/2014