Refine your search

Showing 9 of 9 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
12/19/2014 Became Public Law No: 113-291.
12/19/2014 Signed by President.
12/18/2014 Presented to President.
12/12/2014 Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to House amendment to Senate Amendment to H.R. 3979, under the order of 12/11/14, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, by Yea-Nay Vote. 89 - 11. Record Vote Number: 325.(consideration: CR S6738-6739)
12/04/2014 Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree with an amendment to the Senate amendment Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 300 - 119 (Roll no. 551).(text as House agreed to Senate amendment with an amendment: CR H8388-8621)
04/07/2014 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 59 - 38. Record Vote Number: 101.(text: CR S2176-2178)
03/11/2014 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 410 - 0 (Roll no. 116).(text: CR H2278)
02/25/2014 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 113-360.
01/31/2014 Introduced in House