Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27]* 01/31/2014
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11]* 01/31/2014
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22]* 01/31/2014
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23]* 01/31/2014
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 02/03/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 02/04/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 02/05/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/18/2014