Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 02/03/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/03/2014
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/03/2014
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/03/2014
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/04/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 02/04/2014
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/04/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/05/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 02/05/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 02/05/2014
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 02/06/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 02/11/2014
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 02/11/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/18/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 02/18/2014