Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 01/31/2014
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6]* 01/31/2014
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27]* 01/31/2014
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4]* 01/31/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 01/31/2014
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8]* 01/31/2014
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 01/31/2014
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4]* 01/31/2014
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 01/31/2014
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11]* 01/31/2014
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22]* 01/31/2014
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 01/31/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/31/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14]* 01/31/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 01/31/2014
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 01/31/2014
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 01/31/2014
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 01/31/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 01/31/2014
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 01/31/2014
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 01/31/2014
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4]* 01/31/2014
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 01/31/2014
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16]* 01/31/2014
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3]* 01/31/2014
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 01/31/2014
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 01/31/2014
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 01/31/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 01/31/2014
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 01/31/2014
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23]* 01/31/2014
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 01/31/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 01/31/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 01/31/2014
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9]* 01/31/2014
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 01/31/2014
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 02/03/2014
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 02/03/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/03/2014
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 02/03/2014
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 02/03/2014
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 02/03/2014
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 02/03/2014
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 02/03/2014
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 02/03/2014
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 02/03/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/03/2014
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 02/03/2014
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 02/03/2014
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/03/2014
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 02/03/2014
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 02/03/2014
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 02/03/2014
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 02/03/2014
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 02/03/2014
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 02/03/2014
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 02/03/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 02/03/2014
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/03/2014
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 02/03/2014
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 02/03/2014
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 02/03/2014
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 02/03/2014
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/03/2014
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/03/2014
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 02/03/2014
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/04/2014
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 02/04/2014
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 02/04/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 02/04/2014
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 02/04/2014
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/04/2014
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 02/04/2014
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/04/2014
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 02/04/2014
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 02/04/2014
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 02/05/2014
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 02/05/2014
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 02/05/2014
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 02/05/2014
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/05/2014
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/05/2014
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 02/05/2014
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/05/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/05/2014
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 02/05/2014
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 02/05/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 02/05/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 02/05/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 02/05/2014
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 02/05/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 02/05/2014
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 02/06/2014
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 02/06/2014
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 02/06/2014
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/06/2014
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 02/11/2014
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 02/11/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 02/11/2014
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 02/11/2014
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/11/2014
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 02/11/2014
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/14/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/18/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 02/18/2014
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 02/18/2014