Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 02/03/2014
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 02/03/2014
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 02/03/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 02/03/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/03/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 02/03/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 02/03/2014
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/03/2014
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 02/04/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/04/2014
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/04/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 02/04/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 02/04/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/04/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/05/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/10/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/10/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 02/10/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/10/2014
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 02/10/2014
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 02/10/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 02/10/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 02/10/2014
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 02/10/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 02/11/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 02/11/2014
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/26/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/26/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 02/27/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 02/27/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/06/2014
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 04/28/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 04/28/2014
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/06/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 05/21/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 07/07/2014