Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/04/2014
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/04/2014
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 02/10/2014
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 02/10/2014
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 02/10/2014
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/10/2014
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 02/10/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/10/2014
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 02/18/2014
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 02/21/2014
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 02/21/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 02/21/2014
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 02/28/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/28/2014