Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 02/04/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 02/04/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 02/04/2014
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 03/13/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 04/28/2014
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 05/08/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 05/08/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 05/08/2014
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 05/20/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 05/20/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 05/29/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 09/10/2014