Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 02/04/2014
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 02/04/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 02/04/2014
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 02/05/2014
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 02/05/2014
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 02/06/2014
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 02/06/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 02/10/2014
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 02/10/2014
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 02/10/2014
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 02/10/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 02/10/2014
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 02/11/2014
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 02/11/2014
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 02/25/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/25/2014
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/25/2014
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 02/25/2014
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 02/25/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 02/25/2014
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 02/25/2014
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 02/25/2014
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 02/25/2014
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 02/25/2014
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/26/2014
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/26/2014
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 02/26/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 02/26/2014
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 02/28/2014
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/04/2014
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 03/05/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/05/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/12/2014
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 03/12/2014
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 03/12/2014
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 03/24/2014
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 03/24/2014
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/24/2014
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/24/2014
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 03/24/2014
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/24/2014
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/25/2014
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 03/25/2014
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 04/01/2014
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 04/01/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 04/03/2014
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/03/2014
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 04/03/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 04/09/2014
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 04/10/2014
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 04/29/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/29/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 05/07/2014
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 05/07/2014
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 05/07/2014
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 05/07/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/07/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 05/13/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 05/13/2014
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 05/20/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 05/20/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 05/20/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/21/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 05/21/2014
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 05/21/2014
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 05/22/2014
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 05/28/2014
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 05/30/2014
Rep. McAllister, Vance M. [R-LA-5] 06/09/2014
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 06/09/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 06/11/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 06/11/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/11/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/12/2014
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 06/12/2014
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/25/2014
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 07/08/2014
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 07/08/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 07/10/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 07/15/2014
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 07/15/2014
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/23/2014
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/25/2014
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 07/30/2014
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/30/2014
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/09/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 09/09/2014
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 09/17/2014
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 09/18/2014
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 11/14/2014
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 12/01/2014