Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 02/05/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/06/2014
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 02/06/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 02/11/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/26/2014
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 02/26/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 02/26/2014
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 02/26/2014
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 02/26/2014
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 02/26/2014
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 02/26/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 02/26/2014
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 02/26/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/26/2014
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 02/26/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/05/2014
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/05/2014
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 03/05/2014
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 03/12/2014
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 03/12/2014
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 03/13/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 03/26/2014
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 03/26/2014
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 03/28/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/28/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 04/04/2014
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 04/04/2014
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 04/04/2014
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 04/07/2014
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 04/07/2014
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 04/09/2014
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/09/2014
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 04/09/2014
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 04/09/2014
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 04/09/2014
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 04/28/2014
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 04/28/2014
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 04/28/2014
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 04/28/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 04/28/2014
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/28/2014
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 04/28/2014
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/01/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 05/01/2014
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 05/01/2014
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/01/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/07/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 05/15/2014
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/15/2014
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 05/15/2014
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 05/15/2014
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 05/15/2014
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 05/22/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 05/22/2014
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 05/22/2014
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 05/22/2014
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 05/28/2014
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 05/28/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 05/28/2014
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/28/2014
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/29/2014
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 05/29/2014
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 05/29/2014
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 05/29/2014
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/29/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 06/02/2014
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 06/02/2014
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 06/02/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/02/2014
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 06/05/2014
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/05/2014
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 06/05/2014
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 06/05/2014
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/05/2014
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 06/05/2014
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 06/09/2014
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 06/10/2014
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/10/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 06/10/2014
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 06/10/2014
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 06/11/2014
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 06/11/2014
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 06/12/2014
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/18/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 06/18/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/19/2014
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 06/20/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 06/20/2014
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 06/23/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/23/2014
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 06/24/2014
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 06/25/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/25/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 06/25/2014
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 06/30/2014
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/30/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/30/2014
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 07/03/2014
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 07/03/2014
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 07/08/2014
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 07/08/2014
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 07/09/2014
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 07/09/2014
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 07/10/2014
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 07/14/2014
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 07/14/2014
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 07/14/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/14/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 07/16/2014
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 07/16/2014
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/16/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 07/16/2014
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 07/16/2014
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/17/2014
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/17/2014
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/18/2014
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 07/22/2014
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/22/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 07/23/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/23/2014
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/24/2014
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/24/2014
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 07/24/2014
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 07/24/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/28/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 07/29/2014
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/30/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 07/30/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/30/2014
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/30/2014
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 07/30/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 09/11/2014
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 09/11/2014
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/11/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 09/16/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 09/17/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 11/12/2014
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 11/12/2014
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 11/12/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/12/2014