There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Albuquerque, New Mexico, Federal Land Conveyance Act of 2014

Short Titles as Introduced

Albuquerque, New Mexico, Federal Land Conveyance Act of 2014

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the Administrator of General Services to convey a parcel of real property in Albuquerque, New Mexico, to the Amy Biehl High School Foundation.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
06/17/2014Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5380)
04/09/2014Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 113-408.
02/05/2014Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
06/18/2014SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
06/17/2014-3:23pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/17/2014-3:23pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5380)
06/17/2014-3:16pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3998.
06/17/2014-3:16pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5380-5381)
06/17/2014-3:15pmHouseMr. Young (AK) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
04/09/2014HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 300.
04/09/2014HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 113-408.
03/13/2014HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
03/13/2014HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
03/13/2014HouseSubcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Discharged.
02/06/2014HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
02/05/2014HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
02/05/2014HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 02/26/2014

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure02/05/2014 Referred to
03/13/2014 Markup by
04/09/2014 Reported by H. Rept. 113-408
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management02/06/2014 Referred to
03/13/2014 Discharged from
Senate Environment and Public Works06/18/2014 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.3998. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (06/17/2014)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on April 9, 2014. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Albuquerque, New Mexico, Federal Land Conveyance Act of 2014 - Directs the Administrator of General Services (GSA) to offer to convey to the Amy Biehl High School Foundation certain federal lands, including any improvements on such lands, located in Albuquerque, New Mexico.

Requires such conveyance to be in accordance with a fair market value appraisal that is acceptable to the Administrator.

Makes the Foundation responsible for the costs related to such conveyance.

Requires the proceeds from such conveyance to be paid into the Federal Buildings Fund.

Requires the conveyance to occur within three years of this Act's enactment.