Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 01/29/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 01/29/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 02/05/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 05/14/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 06/14/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/14/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 06/27/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/27/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 06/28/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/28/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/25/2014