Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 02/26/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 02/26/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 02/26/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 02/26/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 02/26/2013
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/04/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 03/13/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 03/13/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/13/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 03/13/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 03/13/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 03/19/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 04/09/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 04/09/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 04/09/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 04/26/2013
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 05/08/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/08/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 06/19/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 06/19/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 07/08/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/08/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 08/02/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 12/12/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 12/12/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 01/31/2014
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 02/11/2014
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 02/26/2014
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/28/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 03/18/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 03/18/2014
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/18/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 03/27/2014
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 04/02/2014
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 04/02/2014
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 05/06/2014
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 05/19/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 05/21/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 06/09/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/09/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/14/2014
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 07/22/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 07/23/2014
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 09/18/2014
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 11/12/2014