Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 02/06/2014
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 02/06/2014
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33]* 02/06/2014
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9]* 02/06/2014
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 02/06/2014
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 02/06/2014
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/06/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/06/2014
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3]* 02/06/2014
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 02/18/2014
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 02/18/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 02/26/2014
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 02/26/2014
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 02/26/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/26/2014
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 02/26/2014
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 02/26/2014
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/26/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 02/26/2014
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/26/2014
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/26/2014
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 02/26/2014
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/26/2014
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 02/28/2014
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 02/28/2014
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/28/2014
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 02/28/2014
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 02/28/2014
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 02/28/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/28/2014
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 02/28/2014
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 02/28/2014
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 03/05/2014
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 03/05/2014
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 03/05/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 03/05/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 03/05/2014
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 03/05/2014
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/05/2014
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/05/2014
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/05/2014
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 03/05/2014
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/05/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/05/2014
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 03/05/2014
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 03/05/2014
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 03/05/2014
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 03/05/2014
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 03/05/2014
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/05/2014
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/05/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 03/05/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 03/05/2014
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/05/2014
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12] 03/05/2014
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 03/05/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 03/05/2014
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 03/05/2014
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/05/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 03/05/2014
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 03/05/2014
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 03/05/2014
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 03/05/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 03/06/2014
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/06/2014
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/06/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 03/06/2014
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 03/06/2014
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 03/06/2014
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 03/06/2014
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 03/06/2014
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 03/06/2014
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/06/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/06/2014
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 03/06/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 03/06/2014
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/06/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 03/06/2014
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/06/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 03/06/2014
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 03/06/2014
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 03/06/2014
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/06/2014
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 03/10/2014
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 03/10/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/10/2014
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/10/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/10/2014
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 03/10/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/10/2014
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 03/10/2014
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 03/10/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 03/10/2014
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 03/10/2014
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 03/10/2014
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 03/10/2014
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/10/2014
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/10/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 03/10/2014
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 03/10/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/10/2014
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/10/2014
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 03/10/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/10/2014
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/11/2014
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 03/11/2014
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 03/11/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/11/2014
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 03/11/2014
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 03/11/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 03/11/2014
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 03/11/2014
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 03/11/2014
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/11/2014
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/12/2014
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/12/2014
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/12/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 03/12/2014