Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 02/11/2014
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 02/11/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/11/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 02/11/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 02/25/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 02/25/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 02/25/2014
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 02/26/2014
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/05/2014
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 03/05/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 03/06/2014
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 03/06/2014
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 03/06/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 03/06/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 03/06/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 03/06/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 03/06/2014
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 03/06/2014
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 03/06/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 03/06/2014
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 03/06/2014
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 03/06/2014
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 03/06/2014
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 03/06/2014
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 03/11/2014
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/12/2014
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 03/13/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/13/2014
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 03/13/2014
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 05/30/2014
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/30/2014
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/30/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 05/30/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 06/18/2014
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 06/18/2014
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/18/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/19/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/11/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/29/2014