Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/25/2014
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 02/25/2014
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 02/25/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/26/2014
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 02/26/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 02/26/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 02/27/2014
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 02/27/2014
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 02/27/2014
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 02/27/2014
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 02/27/2014
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 02/27/2014
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 02/27/2014
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 02/28/2014
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 03/04/2014
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 03/04/2014
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 03/05/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 03/05/2014
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 03/05/2014
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 03/06/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 03/06/2014
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/11/2014
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 03/11/2014
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 03/11/2014
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/12/2014
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 03/12/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 03/13/2014
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 03/14/2014
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/14/2014
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 03/21/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/21/2014
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 03/21/2014
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/24/2014
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 03/24/2014
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 03/24/2014
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 03/24/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/24/2014
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 03/26/2014
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 03/26/2014
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 03/27/2014
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/01/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 04/01/2014
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 04/01/2014
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 04/01/2014
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 04/01/2014
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-23] 04/01/2014
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 04/01/2014
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 04/01/2014
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 04/03/2014
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/03/2014
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 04/03/2014
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 04/03/2014
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 04/03/2014
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 04/03/2014
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 04/04/2014
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 04/04/2014
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 04/04/2014
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 04/04/2014
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 04/04/2014
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 04/07/2014
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 04/07/2014
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 04/07/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 04/07/2014
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/08/2014
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 04/08/2014
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 04/08/2014
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/08/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/08/2014
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 04/10/2014
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 04/10/2014
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 04/10/2014
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 04/28/2014
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 04/28/2014
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 04/28/2014
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 04/28/2014
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 04/28/2014
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/28/2014
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 04/28/2014
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 04/28/2014
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 04/28/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/29/2014
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 04/29/2014
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 04/29/2014
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 04/29/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 04/29/2014
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 04/29/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 04/29/2014
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 04/29/2014
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 04/29/2014
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/29/2014
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 04/30/2014
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/30/2014
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 04/30/2014
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 04/30/2014
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 05/01/2014
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 05/06/2014
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 05/06/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 05/06/2014
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 05/06/2014
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 05/06/2014
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 05/06/2014
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/06/2014
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 05/06/2014
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 05/07/2014
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 05/07/2014
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 05/07/2014
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/07/2014
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 05/09/2014
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 05/09/2014
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/19/2014
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 05/19/2014
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/19/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/19/2014
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 05/19/2014
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/19/2014
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/19/2014
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/19/2014
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 05/19/2014
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/19/2014
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 05/19/2014
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 05/19/2014
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 05/19/2014
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 05/19/2014
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/19/2014
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 05/19/2014
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/19/2014
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/19/2014
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 05/19/2014
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 05/19/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 05/19/2014
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 05/19/2014
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 05/19/2014
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 05/19/2014
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 05/19/2014
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 05/20/2014
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 05/20/2014
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 05/20/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 05/20/2014
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 05/20/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 05/20/2014
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 05/20/2014
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/21/2014