There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To award a Congressional Gold Medal to the Freedom Riders, collectively, in recognition of their unique contribution to Civil Rights, which inspired a revolutionary movement for equality in interstate travel.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/11/2014Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
02/11/2014Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/11/2014Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/11/2014Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (120)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 02/18/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 02/18/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 02/18/2014
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 02/18/2014
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/25/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 02/25/2014
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 02/25/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/25/2014
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 02/25/2014
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/25/2014
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 02/25/2014
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 02/25/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 02/25/2014
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 02/25/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 02/25/2014
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 02/25/2014
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/25/2014
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/25/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 02/26/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 02/26/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 02/26/2014
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 02/26/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/26/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 03/04/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 03/06/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/13/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 03/13/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 03/27/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 05/22/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 06/24/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 06/24/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 06/26/2014
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/26/2014
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 06/26/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 06/26/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/26/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/26/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 06/26/2014
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 06/26/2014
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 07/08/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 07/08/2014
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 07/08/2014
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 07/08/2014
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/08/2014
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 07/08/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/08/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/08/2014
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/08/2014
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 07/08/2014
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/08/2014
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 07/10/2014
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 07/10/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 07/10/2014
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/10/2014
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 07/10/2014
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/10/2014
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/10/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 07/11/2014
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 07/11/2014
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 07/14/2014
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 07/14/2014
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 07/14/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 07/17/2014
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 07/17/2014
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/17/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 07/17/2014
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 07/17/2014
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 07/23/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 07/23/2014
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 07/23/2014

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services02/11/2014 Referred to
House Administration02/11/2014 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4041.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4041. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/11/2014)

Directs the Speaker of the House of Representatives and the President pro tempore of the Senate to arrange for the presentation, on behalf of Congress, of a gold medal to the Freedom Riders in recognition of their contribution to civil rights, which inspired a movement to equality in interstate travel.

Requires such medal to be given to the Smithsonian Institution, where it will be available for display and research. Expresses the sense of Congress that the medal should be made available for display elsewhere, particularly at locations associated with the Freedom Riders.