Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 03/13/2014
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 03/14/2014
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 04/01/2014
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 04/03/2014
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 04/03/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/06/2014
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/09/2014
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 09/09/2014