Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 03/10/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 03/11/2014
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 03/12/2014
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/12/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/26/2014
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/01/2014