Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5]* 02/11/2014
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 02/26/2014
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 02/27/2014
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 04/04/2014
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 04/04/2014
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 04/30/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 05/07/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/09/2014
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 05/23/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 05/28/2014
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 07/11/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/14/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 09/10/2014