Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35]* 02/14/2014
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3]* 02/14/2014
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9]* 02/14/2014
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 02/14/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/14/2014
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16]* 02/14/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/14/2014
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9]* 02/14/2014
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 02/14/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 02/14/2014
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/14/2014
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16]* 02/14/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 02/14/2014
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2]* 02/14/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 02/14/2014
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 02/14/2014
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 02/18/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 02/21/2014
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 03/04/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/04/2014
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/12/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/24/2014
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 04/01/2014
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 04/08/2014
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 04/10/2014
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 04/28/2014
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 04/28/2014
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 04/28/2014
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 04/28/2014
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 04/28/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 04/28/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/29/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 04/29/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/29/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 05/01/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 05/01/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 05/07/2014
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 05/07/2014
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/07/2014