Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5]* 02/14/2014
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 02/18/2014
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/25/2014
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 02/25/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/25/2014
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 02/25/2014
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 02/27/2014
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 02/27/2014
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 02/27/2014
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 02/27/2014
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 02/27/2014
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 02/27/2014
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 02/27/2014
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 02/27/2014
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 02/27/2014
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 02/27/2014
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 02/27/2014
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 02/27/2014
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 02/27/2014
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 02/27/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 02/27/2014
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 02/27/2014
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/28/2014
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/05/2014
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 03/05/2014
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 03/05/2014
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/05/2014
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 03/05/2014
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 03/05/2014
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 03/05/2014
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 03/05/2014
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 03/05/2014
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 03/12/2014
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/12/2014
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 03/12/2014
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 03/12/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/10/2014