Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/06/2014
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/06/2014
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 03/14/2014
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 03/25/2014
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 03/28/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 05/08/2014
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/08/2014
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/30/2014
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 06/09/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/24/2014