Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/18/2014
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 02/27/2014
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 02/27/2014
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 03/14/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 03/25/2014
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 03/25/2014
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 03/28/2014
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 04/02/2014
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 04/03/2014
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 04/09/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/10/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/29/2014
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/15/2014
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 05/22/2014