Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 02/21/2014
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 02/21/2014
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15]* 02/21/2014
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 02/21/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 02/21/2014
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 02/26/2014
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 02/26/2014
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 02/26/2014
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 02/26/2014
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 02/26/2014
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 02/26/2014
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 02/26/2014
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 02/26/2014
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 02/26/2014
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 02/26/2014
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 02/26/2014
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 02/26/2014
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 02/26/2014
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 02/26/2014
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 02/26/2014
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 02/26/2014
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 02/26/2014
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 02/26/2014
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 02/26/2014
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 02/26/2014
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 02/26/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 02/26/2014
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/28/2014
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 02/28/2014
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 03/06/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 03/06/2014
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 03/06/2014
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 03/06/2014
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 03/06/2014
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/14/2014
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 03/14/2014
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 03/14/2014