Refine your search

6 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
03/21/2014 Became Public Law No: 113-90. (TXT | PDF)
03/21/2014 Signed by President.
03/18/2014 Presented to President.
03/13/2014 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S1667-1668)
03/04/2014 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H2103)
02/25/2014 Introduced in House