There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (9)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

HHEATT Act of 2014
Home Heating Emergency Assistance Through Transportation Act of 2014

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

HHEATT Act of 2014
Home Heating Emergency Assistance Through Transportation Act of 2014

Short Titles as Introduced

HHEATT Act of 2014
Home Heating Emergency Assistance Through Transportation Act of 2014

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

HHEATT Act of 2014
Home Heating Emergency Assistance Through Transportation Act of 2014

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To address shortages and interruptions in the availability of propane and other home heating fuels in the United States, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
03/21/2014Became Public Law No: 113-90. (TXT | PDF)
03/21/2014Signed by President.
03/18/2014Presented to President.
03/13/2014Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S1667-1668)
03/04/2014Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H2103)
02/25/2014Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
03/21/2014Became Public Law No: 113-90. (TXT | PDF)
03/21/2014Signed by President.
03/18/2014HousePresented to President.
03/14/2014SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/13/2014SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1667-1668)
03/05/2014SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
03/04/2014-2:30pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2103)
03/04/2014-2:15pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4076.
03/04/2014-2:15pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2103-2106)
03/04/2014-2:14pmHouseMr. Shuster moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
02/26/2014HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
02/25/2014HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
02/25/2014HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (36)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 02/25/2014
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 02/25/2014
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 02/25/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 02/25/2014
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 02/25/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 02/25/2014
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2]* 02/25/2014
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 02/25/2014
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7]* 02/25/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 02/27/2014
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 02/27/2014
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 02/27/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/27/2014
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 02/27/2014
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 02/27/2014
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 02/27/2014
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 02/27/2014
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 02/27/2014
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 02/27/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 02/27/2014
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 02/27/2014
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 02/27/2014
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 02/27/2014
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 02/27/2014
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 02/27/2014
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 02/27/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 02/27/2014
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 03/04/2014
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 03/04/2014
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 03/04/2014
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 03/04/2014
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/04/2014
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 03/04/2014
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/04/2014
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 03/04/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 03/04/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure02/25/2014 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Highways and Transit02/26/2014 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.4076. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 113-90 (03/21/2014)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Home Heating Emergency Assistance Through Transportation Act of 2014 or HHEATT Act of 2014 - Declares that a covered emergency exemption from federal motor carrier safety regulations issued by the Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration (FMCSA) shall remain in effect until May 31, 2014, unless the Secretary of Transportation (DOT) determines that the emergency for which the exemption was provided ends before that date.

Defines "covered emergency exemption" as one issued or extended between February 5, 2014, and the date of enactment of this Act to effect regulatory relief for commercial motor vehicle operations directly assisting the delivery of propane and home heating fuels.

States that nothing in this Act may be construed to prohibit the FMCSA from issuing or extending a covered emergency exemption beyond May 31, 2014, under other federal law.