Text: H.R.4076 — 113th Congress (2013-2014)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 113-90 (03/21/2014)

 
[113th Congress Public Law 90]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]



[[Page 128 STAT. 1037]]

Public Law 113-90
113th Congress

                                 An Act


 
 To address shortages and interruptions in the availability of propane 
    and other home heating fuels in the United States, and for other 
            purposes. <<NOTE: Mar. 21, 2014 -  [H.R. 4076]>> 

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled, <<NOTE: Home Heating 
Emergency Assistance Through Transportation Act of 2014.>> 
SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE.

    This Act may be cited as the ``Home Heating Emergency Assistance 
Through Transportation Act of 2014'' or the ``HHEATT Act of 2014''.
SEC. 2. PROPANE AND HOME HEATING FUEL EMERGENCY TRANSPORTATION.

    (a) <<NOTE: Termination date. Consultation. Determination.>>  In 
General.--Notwithstanding any other provision of law, a covered 
emergency exemption issued by the Federal Motor Carrier Safety 
Administration shall remain in effect until May 31, 2014, unless the 
Secretary of Transportation, after consultation with the Governors of 
affected States, determines that the emergency for which the exemption 
was provided ends before that date.

    (b) Covered Emergency Exemption Defined.--In this section, the term 
``covered emergency exemption'' means an exemption issued under section 
390.23 of title 49, Code of Federal Regulations, or extended under 
section 390.25 of such title that--
            (1) was issued or extended during the period beginning on 
        February 5, 2014, and ending on the date of enactment of this 
        Act; and
            (2) provided regulatory relief for commercial motor vehicle 
        operations providing direct assistance supporting the delivery 
        of propane and home heating fuels.

    (c) Rule of Construction.--Nothing in subsection (a) may be 
construed to prohibit the Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration 
from issuing or extending a covered emergency exemption beyond May 31, 
2014, under other Federal law.

    Approved March 21, 2014.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--H.R. 4076:
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

CONGRESSIONAL RECORD, Vol. 160 (2014):
            Mar. 4, considered and passed House.
            Mar. 13, considered and passed Senate.

                                  <all>