Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 03/26/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 05/02/2014
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 05/09/2014
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 05/09/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 05/20/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 05/28/2014