Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 02/26/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 03/26/2014
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 04/03/2014
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/03/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/09/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 05/02/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 05/06/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 05/06/2014
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 05/07/2014
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 05/09/2014
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 05/09/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 05/20/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 05/28/2014