Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/25/2014
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 03/05/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 03/14/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/24/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/03/2014
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 04/03/2014
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 04/03/2014
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/03/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/08/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 04/29/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/29/2014
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 04/29/2014
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 04/29/2014
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 04/29/2014
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 04/29/2014
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 04/29/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/09/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 05/09/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/09/2014
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 05/09/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/09/2014
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 05/09/2014
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 05/09/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/20/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/20/2014
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 05/20/2014
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/20/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 05/20/2014
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 05/20/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 05/20/2014
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/20/2014
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 05/20/2014