Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 02/26/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 02/26/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 02/26/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/26/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 02/26/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 02/26/2014
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 02/26/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 02/26/2014
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6]* 02/26/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 02/26/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 02/26/2014
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2]* 02/26/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 02/26/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 02/26/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 02/26/2014
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9]* 02/26/2014
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 02/26/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 02/26/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 02/28/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 02/28/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/28/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 02/28/2014
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 03/04/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 03/04/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 03/06/2014
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 03/06/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 03/06/2014
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/06/2014
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/06/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/06/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/06/2014
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 03/06/2014
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/12/2014
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/12/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 03/13/2014
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 03/14/2014
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/24/2014
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 04/28/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 04/28/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 05/01/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 05/07/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 05/07/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 05/07/2014
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/19/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/11/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/19/2014