There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Horse Protection Amendments Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Horse Protection Act to provide increased protection for horses participating in shows, exhibitions, or sales, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/26/2014Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
02/28/2014Referred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/26/2014Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/26/2014Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (12)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3]* 02/26/2014
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 02/26/2014
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 02/26/2014
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 02/26/2014
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 02/26/2014
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8]* 02/26/2014
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6]* 02/26/2014
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 02/26/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 02/26/2014
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 03/25/2014
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/26/2014
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 05/27/2014
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/22/2014 07/24/2014 --

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce02/26/2014 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade02/28/2014 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4098. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/26/2014)

Horse Protection Amendments Act of 2013 [sic] - Amends the Horse Protection Act to replace the Designated Qualified Persons program responsible for inspecting horses for soring with a new inspection system. (The soring of horses is any of various actions taken on a horse's limb to produce a higher gait that may cause pain, distress, inflammation, or lameness.)

Requires the Secretary of Agriculture (USDA) to establish a single Horse Industry Organization (HIO) in order to establish a formal affiliation with the management of each horse sale, horse exhibition, and horse sale or auction, appoint inspectors to conduct inspections, and otherwise ensure compliance with the Horse Protection Act.

Directs the appointment of individuals by the Commissioners of Agriculture for Tennessee and Kentucky to govern the HIO. Requires those individuals to appoint individuals representing the Tennessee Walking Horse industry.