Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7]* 02/27/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 02/28/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/28/2014
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 02/28/2014
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 02/28/2014
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 03/06/2014
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/06/2014
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 03/24/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 03/24/2014
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 04/28/2014
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 04/28/2014
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/22/2014
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 05/22/2014
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 05/28/2014
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 05/28/2014
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 06/05/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 06/10/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 07/03/2014
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 07/29/2014