Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 01/23/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/05/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 02/13/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 02/13/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/13/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 02/26/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/12/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 03/13/2013
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 04/09/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 04/09/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 04/10/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/18/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/24/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 05/07/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 06/04/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 06/17/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 06/26/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 07/18/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 07/31/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/10/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 09/11/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/11/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 10/10/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 10/15/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 10/22/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/23/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 10/28/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/29/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 11/13/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 12/19/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 01/07/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 01/07/2014
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 01/08/2014
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 01/31/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 01/31/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/04/2014
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 02/10/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 02/25/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 03/04/2014
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 03/05/2014
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 03/06/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 04/07/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 04/07/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/28/2014
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 05/09/2014
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/09/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 05/20/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 05/28/2014
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/29/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/09/2014
Rep. McAllister, Vance M. [R-LA-5] 06/09/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/17/2014
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 06/24/2014
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 06/24/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/26/2014
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 07/22/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/24/2014
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 07/24/2014
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/25/2014
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 07/25/2014
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 07/29/2014
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 07/29/2014
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 07/29/2014
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 09/08/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 09/08/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 09/08/2014
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 09/16/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 11/12/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 11/12/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 11/12/2014
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 11/12/2014
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/12/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 12/02/2014