Refine your search

7 results for Major Actions
Date Major Actions
05/16/2014 Became Public Law No: 113-102.
05/16/2014 Signed by President.
05/07/2014 Presented to President.
05/05/2014 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S2676)
04/28/2014 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 384 - 0 (Roll no. 179).(text: CR H3217)
04/28/2014 Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-421.
02/28/2014 Introduced in House