Refine your search

Showing 22 of 22 total for All Actions.
Date Chamber All Actions
05/16/2014 Became Public Law No: 113-102.
05/16/2014 Signed by President.
05/07/2014 House Presented to President.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/06/2014 Senate Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Type of Action: Resolving Differences
Action By: Senate
05/05/2014 Senate Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2676)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: Senate
04/29/2014 Senate Received in the Senate, read twice.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: Senate
04/28/2014-7:07pm House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 384 - 0 (Roll no. 179). (text: CR H3217)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
04/28/2014-6:58pm House Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3220-3221)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
04/28/2014-5:41pm House At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
04/28/2014-5:35pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4120.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
04/28/2014-5:35pm House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3217-3218)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
04/28/2014-5:35pm House Mr. Young (AK) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
04/28/2014 House Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 311.
Type of Action: Calendars
Action By: House of Representatives
04/28/2014 House Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-421.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Natural Resources
04/09/2014 House Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Natural Resources
04/09/2014 House Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Natural Resources
04/09/2014 House Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation Discharged.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Natural Resources
03/25/2014 House Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation
03/05/2014 House Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Natural Resources
02/28/2014 House Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives
02/28/2014 House Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives
02/28/2014 House Introduced in House
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives