Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 02/28/2014
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 02/28/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19]* 02/28/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 02/28/2014
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 02/28/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 04/04/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/04/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/07/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/07/2014
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 05/07/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 05/28/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/10/2014
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/10/2014
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 06/12/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/12/2014
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/12/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 06/12/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/12/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 06/12/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 06/17/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/17/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 06/17/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 06/26/2014
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 06/26/2014
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 06/30/2014
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/18/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 07/18/2014
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 07/24/2014
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 09/10/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 09/10/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/11/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 09/18/2014
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 11/12/2014