Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15]* 03/04/2014
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 03/04/2014
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 03/05/2014
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 03/05/2014
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/05/2014
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/05/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 03/05/2014
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/05/2014
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/06/2014
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 03/06/2014
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 03/06/2014
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 03/13/2014
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 03/13/2014
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/13/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/25/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 03/26/2014
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 03/27/2014