Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 03/04/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 03/12/2014
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 03/14/2014
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 03/18/2014
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/21/2014
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 03/25/2014
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 03/26/2014
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/26/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/09/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 04/10/2014
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 05/06/2014
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 05/06/2014
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 05/06/2014
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 05/08/2014
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 05/19/2014
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 05/20/2014
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 05/20/2014
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/02/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 06/05/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 06/30/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/03/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 07/09/2014
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 07/09/2014
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 07/09/2014
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 07/14/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 07/14/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/15/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 07/16/2014
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/18/2014
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 07/18/2014
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/22/2014
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 07/24/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/24/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 07/29/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 08/01/2014