Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/04/2014
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/26/2014
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 05/08/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 06/05/2014
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/18/2014
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 07/18/2014