Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 03/12/2014
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 03/14/2014
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/21/2014
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 03/25/2014
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/26/2014
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 05/06/2014
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 05/06/2014
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 05/06/2014
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 05/08/2014
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 05/20/2014
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 07/09/2014
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 07/14/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 07/16/2014
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/18/2014
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 07/18/2014
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/22/2014
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 07/24/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 07/29/2014