Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 03/04/2014
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 03/04/2014
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/04/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 03/25/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 06/09/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 06/17/2014
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 11/12/2014