There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Humane Cosmetics Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To phase out cosmetic animal testing and the sale of cosmetics tested on animals.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/05/2014Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
03/07/2014Referred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/05/2014Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/05/2014Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (56)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/11/2014
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/11/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 03/11/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/11/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 03/11/2014
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 03/11/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/11/2014
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 03/11/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 03/11/2014
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 03/11/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 03/13/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 03/13/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 03/13/2014
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/13/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/13/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/13/2014
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 03/13/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/13/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/24/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/24/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 03/24/2014
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 03/24/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/01/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/01/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 04/01/2014
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 04/01/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/01/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 04/01/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 04/01/2014
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 04/01/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 04/08/2014
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/08/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 04/08/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 04/08/2014
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 04/08/2014
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 04/28/2014
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 04/28/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 04/28/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/28/2014
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 04/28/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 04/30/2014
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 05/20/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/20/2014
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/20/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 05/20/2014
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/18/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 06/24/2014
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 07/10/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 07/10/2014
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 07/17/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 07/22/2014
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/22/2014
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 07/25/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 07/31/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 09/09/2014
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/14/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce03/05/2014 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade03/07/2014 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4148.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4148. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/05/2014)

Humane Cosmetics Act - Prohibits: (1) any entity from conducting or contracting for cosmetic animal testing in the United States, in or affecting interstate commerce, effective on the date that is one year after enactment of this Act; and (2) selling, offering for sale, or transporting in interstate commerce any cosmetic if the final product or any component was developed or manufactured using cosmetic animal testing conducted or contracted for after such date, effective three years after this Act's enactment.